ALCOHOL RESEARCH UK

Charity number: 1140287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £661.23k £528.61k £925.19k £835.38k £872.83k
Total expenditure £829.18k £1.78m £1.65m £1.37m £1.39m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £66.35k N/A £32.77k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £66.35k £158.72k £201.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £96.83k £11.30k £56.56k £54.63k £76.94k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £9.70k £21.12k
Income - Charitable activities £36.27k £13.50k £307.72k £268.92k £292.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £528.13k £503.81k £506.26k £500.77k £482.17k
Income - Other £0 £0 £54.65k £1.35k £0
Income - Legacies £89.75k £0 £11.14k £3.00k £18.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £700.16k £1.23m £1.51m £1.22m £1.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £129.03k £110.28k £136.22k £147.43k £261.61k
Expenditure - Governance £64.63k £15.84k £45.01k £40.09k £66.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £294.23k £771.59k £340.98k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £66.89k £62.86k £80.99k £68.75k £70.35k
Expenditure - Other £0 £50.35k £0 £0 £0