Financial history THE AFRICAN ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1141553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £114.22k £76.78k £29.81k £40.77k £13.24k
Total expenditure £106.56k £33.57k £49.05k £56.20k £11.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A