Accounts and annual returns MARIE-LOUISE VON MOTESICZKY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1140890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 14 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window