Financial history MARIE-LOUISE VON MOTESICZKY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1140890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £135.40k £76.71k £36.47k £5.30k £14.27k
Total expenditure £1.12m £2.70m £1.08m £2.88m £1.01m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A