LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST

Charity number: 1141797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.50m £1.52m £1.70m
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.54m £1.36m £1.48m
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £95.88k £21.57k £106.82k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £77.05k £30.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.38m £1.38m £1.38m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £70.00k
Income - Investment N/A N/A £22.63k £35.58k £179.59k
Income - Other N/A N/A £4.17k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £14.56k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.54m £1.35m £1.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £4.46k £4.75k £18.72k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.97k £0 £12.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £4.46k £0 £18.72k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0