Financial history Opus 2

Charity number: 1141323
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022
Total gross income £5.29k £3.76k £5.41k £1.42k £2.88k
Total expenditure £7.19k £2.60k £3.74k £0 £2.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A