MOORFIELDS EYE CHARITY

Charity number: 1140679
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY BRIAM Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Noland Burr Carter Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
David Llewellyn Probert Trustee 23 March 2016 None on record
Dr LEE-ANN COLEMAN Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
Robert John Jones Trustee 07 June 2017 None on record
MICHAEL DONALD MCCARTNEY IZZA Trustee 06 September 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR SIR ERIC JACKSON THOMAS Trustee 06 September 2017
H R H THE DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S COMMONWEALTH STUDY CONFERENCE (UK FUND) Charity reporting is up to date
New Model Institute for Technology and Engineering Charity reporting is up to date
ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS Charity reporting is up to date
Mervyn Alexander S Walker Chair 25 November 2015 None on record
Louisa Wickham Trustee 04 January 2021 None on record
ANDREW BALLHEIMER Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Caroline Jan MacEwen Dr Trustee 04 June 2019
HEALTHCARE QUALITY IMPROVEMENT PARTNERSHIP Charity reporting is up to date
Johanna Moss Trustee 07 June 2017 None on record
MRS VICKY HASTINGS Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
COLIN WILLIAM MACLEAN OBE Trustee 26 January 2016
MY CANCER MY CHOICES Charity reporting is up to date