MIGRANT VOICE

Charity number: 1142963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £193.03k £216.39k £106.78k £249.44k £262.16k
Total expenditure £167.05k £180.65k £169.42k £198.91k £268.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A