MIGRANT VOICE

Charity number: 1142963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILFRED HYDE SULLIVAN Trustee 01 December 2020
UK RACE AND EUROPE NETWORK Overdue by 596 days
Habib Rahman Chair 02 December 2013 None on record
JASON RAY BERGEN Trustee 19 July 2011
AGEING WITHOUT CHILDREN Recently registered
Niketha Gamage-Watson Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
SOFI TAYLOR Trustee 11 February 2016 None on record
Prof Ferdinando Sigona Trustee 13 October 2017 None on record
Dorrie Chetty Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Maurice Aden Wren Trustee 06 January 2014 None on record