THE VINCENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1153457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WENDY SCOTT Chair 21 November 2016 None on record
Rosa Blandford Trustee 15 July 2017 None on record
JOHN RUFUS BARNES Trustee 13 July 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAFFRON WALDEN Received: On time
LIZ WOODS Trustee 21 November 2016 None on record
Dr Alison Davies Trustee 24 October 2020 None on record
REVD CANNON PHILIP HARRIS Trustee 16 July 2017 None on record
Rev Timothy Butlin Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record
Joy Sims Trustee 15 July 2017 None on record
ROBIN ALDRIDGE Trustee 21 November 2016 None on record
Kurpa Patel Trustee 23 October 2020 None on record