ZONTA LONDON FUND

Charity number: 1143825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.89k £4.82k £5.58k £6.48k £9.24k
Total expenditure £3.80k £5.98k £5.64k £8.35k £10.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A