Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTLE

Charity number: 1141300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window