Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTLE
Charity number: 1141300

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Reverend Lee Christopher James Duckett | Chair | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Ann Dixon | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Richards | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Selmon | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Roberts | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Collins | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kieran Hills | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Christina Staton | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Murray | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lewis | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Phillip Collins | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Williams | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cox | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JUDITH HASSELL | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ELIZABETH THORP Mrs | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.