Financial history XTND - IMPROVING FUTURES

Charity number: 1141966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £153.36k £106.32k £106.01k £71.74k £90.33k
Total expenditure £127.59k £78.75k £96.48k £101.95k £67.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k N/A