Trustees XTND - IMPROVING FUTURES

Charity number: 1141966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Annette Pybus Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Marie Berry Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
Rev TIMOTHY JOHN ERRIDGE Trustee 04 September 2017
None on record
John Porter Trustee 04 October 2016
None on record
Justin Harvey-Bennett Trustee 22 October 2013
None on record
ADAM MATTHEWS Trustee 17 May 2011
SIDCOT SCHOOL
Received: On time
MRS LYN HUNT Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record