Financial history RESPECT

Charity number: 1141636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £675.80k £754.84k £1.52m £1.59m £2.78m
Total expenditure £713.00k £703.58k £1.39m £1.61m £2.32m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £297.81k £348.82k £1.28m £940.92k £1.29m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.91k £1.39k £5.34k £8.58k £29.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £668.88k £753.45k £1.52m £1.58m £2.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13 £1 £11 £40 £12
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £22.13k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £702.50k £696.23k £1.38m £1.58m £2.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.50k £7.35k £8.63k £27.11k £1.30k
Expenditure - Governance £70.17k £110.83k £225.89k £0 £247.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0