Trustees RESPECT

Charity number: 1141636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Mullen Chair 23 February 2016
None on record
David Gadd Trustee 19 January 2022
None on record
Hilary McCollum Trustee 19 January 2022
None on record
Kevin Steele Trustee 19 January 2022
None on record
Michael Collins Trustee 19 January 2022
None on record
Sope Otulana Trustee 03 March 2021
None on record
Talia Kensit Trustee 03 March 2021
None on record
Millie Brown Trustee 03 March 2021
None on record
Leyly Bogue Trustee 03 March 2021
None on record
Amra Dautovic Trustee 03 March 2021
None on record
Rachel Morrison Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
Diane Scott Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
SAMANTHA DARBY Trustee 15 October 2014
None on record