Financial history DEEPINGS YOUTH GROUP

Charity number: 1142801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.94k £29.34k £22.11k £21.87k £22.42k
Total expenditure £20.53k £27.66k £16.47k £13.19k £12.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £15.00k £18.00k N/A