17TH HULL BOYS BRIGADE

Charity number: 1146775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 August 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 January 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required