17TH HULL BOYS BRIGADE

Charity number: 1146775
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £1.78k £1.78k £1.68k £1.90k £1.98k
Total expenditure £2.21k £2.21k £2.11k £2.56k £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A