Accounts and annual returns PTA GREAT CROSBY PRIMARY CATHOLIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1143850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 16 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required