Financial history PTA GREAT CROSBY PRIMARY CATHOLIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1143850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £12.45k £19.86k £16.10k £10.36k £0
Total expenditure £8.69k £22.23k £18.50k £7.20k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A