BILL QUAY COMMUNITY FARM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1146471
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £196.97k £184.65k £114.80k £94.40k £50.34k
Total expenditure £185.24k £175.71k £134.52k £105.84k £54.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.20k £0 £25.00k £65.00k £30.00k