Financial history ABBOTT WELFARE CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1142661
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £9.24k £0 £1.20k £4.84k £0
Total expenditure £9.20k £0 £1.20k £4.84k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A