ST CHAD'S COLLEGE DURHAM

Charity number: 1142958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £2.76m £2.66m £2.67m £2.79m £2.30m
Total expenditure £2.21m £2.26m £2.35m £2.49m £2.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £190.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £216.97k £105.50k £206.12k £107.84k £269.26k
Income - Other trading activities £25.94k £14.24k £27.56k £156.98k £3.97k
Income - Charitable activities £2.43m £2.37m £2.38m £2.49m £2.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £81.40k £170.58k £55.53k £34.02k £31.63k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £50.00k £86.77k £0 £34.28k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.25m £2.25m £2.34m £2.33m £2.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.32k £4.76k £3.65k £51.15k £18.92k
Expenditure - Governance £56.16k £37.68k £62.16k £59.23k £30.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £109.00k £11.36k