ST CHAD'S COLLEGE DURHAM

Charity number: 1142958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Simon Jon Hackett Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Elisabeth Rowark Trustee 19 September 2013 None on record
Professor Rosemary Jane MacNaughton Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
PAUL GEOFFREY CHANDLER Trustee 06 May 2015
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN BIBLE SOCIETY Received: On time
COUNTY DURHAM COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Received: On time
SHARED INTEREST FOUNDATION Received: On time
Alan Arthur Buckle Trustee 22 September 2016 None on record
Dr Jennifer Anne King Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
Emilia Katharine Hepple Trustee 18 March 2021 None on record
Olivian Wong Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
JOHN PHILIP BIRKETT MARSHALL Trustee 19 April 2018 None on record
Rev Preb Richard Springer Trustee 10 December 2020
SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GEORGE-IN-THE-EAST WITH ST. PAUL Received: On time
Alexander McCallion Trustee 29 November 2018 None on record
RICHARD TAYLOR Trustee 15 January 2013 None on record
Rev Mark Woodruff Trustee 14 December 2017
THE FELLOWSHIP OF ST ALBAN AND ST SERGIUS Received: On time
THE CATHOLIC LEAGUE Received: On time
THE ECUMENICAL MARIAN PILGRIMAGE TRUST Received: On time
Dr Margaret Jane Masson Trustee 01 March 2016 None on record
Colin Peter Ferguson Trustee 27 June 2019 None on record
Jenny Haworth Trustee 19 September 2013 None on record
Hala Rachael Heenan Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record