THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALCOT, BATH

Charity number: 1142099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £245.96k £255.04k £218.59k £432.66k £187.55k
Total expenditure £241.60k £250.02k £254.25k £258.88k £206.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £8.37k