WOODSIDE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1143122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.53m £1.50m £1.54m £1.61m £1.02m
Total expenditure £1.45m £1.33m £1.36m £1.40m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £186.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £859.18k £813.98k £900.71k £1.02m £453.43k
Income - Other trading activities £541.01k £549.24k £505.53k £460.83k £213.30k
Income - Charitable activities £66.30k £69.90k £72.95k £67.89k £54.45k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £60.58k £69.04k £56.03k £60.05k £63.52k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £233.68k
Income - Legacies £653.90k £560.73k £671.02k £842.34k £220.03k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £924.97k £988.55k £1.03m £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £433.85k £408.25k £375.91k £364.00k £279.18k
Expenditure - Governance £8.60k £7.45k £7.45k £7.17k £8.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0