WOODSIDE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1143122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET MARY GORMAN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Miranda Mary Maclean Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
ANNE MARSHALL Trustee 21 April 2015
WOODSIDE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST Received: On time
Margaret sandra Gudonis Trustee 27 January 2019
WOODSIDE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST Received: On time
JENNIFER MARGARET ROGERS Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
CAROLE BOWLES MBE Trustee 18 July 2011
THE ANIMAL DEFENCE TRUST Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PLYMOUTH AND SOUTH WEST DEVON BRANCH Received: On time
WOODSIDE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST Received: On time
ROY THOMAS STOKES Trustee 27 October 2020
WOODSIDE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST Received: On time