AL-MAHDI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1146363
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £37.56k £46.88k £42.68k £37.91k £41.92k
Total expenditure £20.21k £18.83k £25.34k £24.91k £29.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A