Financial history SOUTH EAST WALES RIVERS TRUST

Charity number: 1145724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £125.22k £216.21k £204.28k £303.63k £212.05k
Total expenditure £91.85k £92.92k £92.92k £216.22k £187.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.41k N/A £171.20k