Financial history SRI LANKAN MUSLIM FOUNDATION CRAWLEY

Charity number: 1144111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £40.06k £31.64k £33.01k £54.42k £54.96k
Total expenditure £26.89k £31.16k £47.80k £34.19k £39.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k