Trustees SRI LANKAN MUSLIM FOUNDATION CRAWLEY

Charity number: 1144111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SEYED MOHAMED MOHAMED ZAKEER Chair 04 October 2011
None on record
MOHAMED FIYAZ MOHAMED MARZOOK Trustee 25 July 2021
None on record
RAZI MOHAMED ABDUL FARID Trustee 25 July 2021
None on record
MOHAMED MUZAMMIL MOHAMED THAHIR Trustee 26 November 2017
None on record
MOUFEED MOHAMED Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
ILHAM THASSIM Trustee 22 June 2014
None on record
RAZMY NAZEER MOHAMED Trustee 04 October 2011
None on record
HABEEBULLAKHAN MOHAMMED IMRAN Trustee 04 October 2011
None on record