SESKU ACADEMY

Charity number: 1143258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £378.38k £201.19k £222.20k £188.96k £125.17k
Total expenditure £315.84k £258.93k £233.41k £207.03k £138.64k
Income from government contracts £129.08k £60.00k £60.00k £102.00k £104.59k
Income from government grants £0 £2.00k N/A N/A £10.00k