SHEFFIELD MUSIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1143420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £268.22k £311.17k £334.28k £378.12k £470.85k
Total expenditure £266.93k £295.69k £322.40k £387.77k £448.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £193.63k £211.63k £237.34k £237.92k £297.01k