SHEFFIELD MUSIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1143420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EMILY PIETERS Trustee 03 April 2018 None on record
Alice Olusoga Trustee 12 June 2016 None on record
John Payne Trustee 05 October 2020
CHRISTIAN ECOLOGY LINK Received: On time
Ian Falconer Trustee 15 February 2014 None on record
Angela Brumpton Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
TRISHA COOPER Chair 17 August 2011 None on record
Rachel Mallaband Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Jonathan Armstrong Trustee 12 June 2016 None on record
ELIZABETH UNDERWOOD Trustee 12 June 2016 None on record