BEANI BAZAR WELFARE TRUST UK

Charity number: 1144944
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 August 2021 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 August 2021 118 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 October 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 July 2019 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 July 2019 77 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 July 2017 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 12 July 2017 73 days late Download