LAW FOR LIFE: THE FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC LEGAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1143589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £258.35k £278.10k £279.47k £331.07k £365.88k
Total expenditure £248.92k £274.53k £279.14k £316.40k £354.70k
Income from government contracts £44.78k £0 £40.30k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.09k £91.85k £91.85k £91.85k £91.85k