THE NOTTINGHAM & NOTTINGHAMSHIRE VICTORIA CROSS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1144298
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 636 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 636 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 January 2017 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 08 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required