Trustees THE SAINT PAUL'S TRUST OF PENZANCE
Charity number: 1143691

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Louise Fitzsimmons | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Prudence Willday | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|||||||
Judith Byrne | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Edward Hygate | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev SIAN YATES | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|||||||
HILARY JANET TYREMAN | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.