THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII

Charity number: 1143423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £18.81m £31.23m £33.28m £31.84m £34.02m
Total expenditure £27.36m £25.94m £31.86m £37.98m £34.46m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £914.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.56m £4.88m £3.17m £3.06m £2.52m
Income - Other trading activities £925.00k £787.00k £935.00k £936.00k £1.08m
Income - Charitable activities £11.65m £12.64m £13.15m £13.19m £11.28m
Income - Endowments £2.90m £3.04m £1.75m £2.45m £2.03m
Income - Investment £5.50m £15.90m £17.64m £16.99m £20.08m
Income - Other £76.00k £74.00k £133.00k £126.00k £1.11m
Income - Legacies £8.49k £87.15k £87.04k £24.00k £109.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.24m £20.87m £25.56m £31.01m £28.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.12m £5.06m £6.30m £6.33m £4.86m
Expenditure - Governance £43.00k £49.00k £48.00k £47.00k £50.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.57m £2.80m £3.62m £5.42m £4.24m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £652.00k £865.00k