THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII

Charity number: 1143423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

62 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr SOPHIE DUNCAN Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR PETER MCDONALD Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
The Venerable Jonathan Paul Michael Chaffey CB Trustee 01 May 2020
BAYNE BENEFACTION Received: On time
OXFORD CLERGY CHARITY Received: On time
NEW HINKSEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AND SCHOOL HOUSE OXFORDSHIRE Received: On time
PROFESSOR GUY RODERICK WILKINSON Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
JAMES CAMERON FITZGERALD SEYMOUR LAWRIE Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR STEVEN GRAHL Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR MISHTOONI CARYS ANNE BOSE Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR MALCOLM DUNCAN McCULLOCH Trustee 29 July 2011
WESLEY MEMORIAL OXFORD METHODIST CHURCH Received: 19 days late
Dr ALEXANDER VASUDEVAN Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Rev Richard Charles Peers Trustee 01 September 2020
THE COMMUNITY OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN AT WANTAGE Received: On time
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR AXEL KUHN Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR RICHARD BROWNING RUTHERFORD Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Dr BELINDA ELIZABETH JACK Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR JONATHAN GUY EVRILL CROSS Trustee 29 July 2011
SPECTRA ENSEMBLE Recently registered
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR LAURENCE BRASSART Trustee 29 July 2019 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR JASON J DAVIS Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR RICHARD WADE-MARTINS Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR SARAH LOUISE ROWLAND-JONES Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Dr Matthias Holweg Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR LINDSAY JUDSON Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR GREGORY HUTCHINSON Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR KAYLA CHRISTINA KING Trustee 01 October 2013 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR GERALDINE A JOHNSON Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
KARL STEPHEN STERNBERG Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Dr Ewan Murray Smith Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR IAN WATSON Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Sarah Mortimer Trustee 29 July 2011
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE UNIVERSITY CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN Received: On time
Dr Francesco Giusti Trustee 01 October 2021 None on record
CANON PROFESSOR CAROL HARRISON Trustee 20 April 2015
THE ARCHBISHOP'S EXAMINATION IN THEOLOGY TRUST Received: On time
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR JOSEPH SCHEAR Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR SIMON JAMES DADSON Trustee 03 January 2012 None on record
Dr KATHERINE LEBOW Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
PAULINE LINIERES-HARTLEY Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
VERY REVEREND PROFESSOR MARTYN PERCY Chair 01 October 2014
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
Dr Natoua Romuald Meango Trustee 01 September 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR DIRK AARTS Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR ALEXANDER KUO Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR BRIAN WALTER YOUNG Trustee 29 July 2011
LORD DACRE OF GLANTON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: 39 days late
PROFESSOR RICHARD BARKER Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR EDWIN JOHN FLETCHER SIMPSON Trustee 29 July 2011
THE FRIDESWIDE FOUNDATION Overdue by 973 days
PROFESSOR ROGER LLEWELYN DAVIES Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Dr YARIN GAL Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Dr DOMINIC PAUL MORAN Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR MARK JULIAN EDWARDS Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
THE REVD CANON PROFESSOR SARAH ROSAMUND IRVINE FOOT Trustee 03 November 2011
THE FRIDESWIDE FOUNDATION Overdue by 973 days
THE ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR JENNIFER YEE Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR SIMON HISCOCK Trustee 06 July 2015
THE NEW PHYTOLOGIST FOUNDATION Received: On time
CANON PROFESSOR NIGEL JOHN BIGGAR Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Associate Professor Ciara Kennefick Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
LIESL ELDER Trustee 29 November 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR SIR JOHN IRVINE BELL Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR SIMON LOUIS NEWSTEAD Trustee 02 April 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR STEFAN NEUBAUER Trustee 30 August 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR SAM HOWISON Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR EDWARD GEOFFREY WOLFE KEENE Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR STEPHANIE J CRAGG MA DPHIL Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
CANON PROFESSOR GRAHAM WARD Trustee 17 October 2012 None on record
Dr ANNA JANE CLARK Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR KEVIN McGERTY Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR BRIAN PARKINSON Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR SIR TIMOTHY JOHN BERNERS-LEE Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
Professor Yuji Nakatsukasa Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record