PRISTON FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1143394
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 December 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 February 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required