PRISTON FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1143394
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £12.68k £10.61k £11.78k £14.09k £16.44k
Total expenditure £10.35k £10.38k £10.67k £13.42k £14.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A