NESTA

Charity number: 1144091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.49m £24.91m £24.66m £34.43m £43.35m
Total expenditure £25.67m £33.37m £32.23m £42.35m £47.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £8.92m £1.64m N/A
Income from government grants £1.51m £10.10m £5.05m £3.53m £14.14m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.45m £3.28m £7.09m £8.93m £7.44m
Income - Charitable activities £10.91m £20.50m £16.61m £13.18m £25.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.01m £540.00k £354.58k £6.67m £10.12m
Income - Other £116.00k £585.00k £606.77k £5.65m £514.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.83m £29.75m £25.32m £36.51m £42.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.84m £3.62m £6.91m £5.85m £5.04m
Expenditure - Governance £410.00k £134.00k £871.96k £478.00k £489.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.13m £11.14m £3.60m £7.92m £7.72m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.28m £1.59m £1.66m £1.33m £1.15m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0