Trustees NESTA

Charity number: 1144091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Bennett Biddle King Trustee 01 October 2022
THE GIRLS' DAY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Elizabeth Jean Ditchburn Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Seun Akindele Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Catherine Mary Brien Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Edward Richards Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Ian Pierre Gomes Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Jimmy Wales Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Sarah Hunter Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Christina McComb OBE Trustee 19 March 2019
None on record
Heider Ridha Trustee 19 March 2019
THE SOCIAL MOBILITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Judy Gibbons Trustee 09 November 2017
ORANGE TREE THEATRE LTD
Received: On time
PETERSHAM ENVIRONMENT TRUST LTD
Overdue by 200 days
Anthony William Lilley OBE Trustee 09 November 2017
LAUGHTON PARISH HALL
Received: On time