FALMOUTH & EXETER STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1145405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 27 March 2018 On time Download