TRANSFORMATION CPR

Charity number: 1146238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £68.26k £47.74k £47.57k £55.00k £340.00k
Total expenditure £61.19k £60.44k £52.51k £54.00k £95.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £6.00k