SWANFIELD CHAPEL

Charity number: 1143499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £65.83k £53.65k £69.02k £92.49k £128.92k
Total expenditure £56.04k £54.74k £55.46k £87.85k £119.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A