Financial history TAVY DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.81k £11.87k £11.28k £8.97k £17.18k
Total expenditure £11.88k £5.76k £9.52k £5.52k £4.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k